skip to content

ONE Fertility Kitchener Waterloo

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
4271 King Street East
Suite 200
Kitchener Ontario N2P 2X7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 26, 2021 Pass View PDF
Feb 10, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 31, 2015 Pass View PDF
Apr 17, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF