skip to content

Cosmetic Surgery Clinic - Waterloo

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
50 Albert Street
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3S2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Nov 11, 2019 Pending
Oct 17, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 19, 2017 Pass View PDF
Jul 04, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 30, 2013 Pass View PDF