skip to content

Advanced Surgical Operatory Ltd.

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
230 Victoria Street
London Ontario N6A 2C2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 22, 2020 Pass View PDF
Aug 24, 2020 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 25, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 22, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 19, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF