skip to content

Peel Laser & Vein Vascular Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
18 Kensington Road
Suite 500
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 08, 2021 Withdrawal
Oct 11, 2019 Pass View PDF
Sep 30, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 07, 2016 Pass View PDF
Jun 23, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF