skip to content

Don Valley Endoscopy Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 308
Toronto Ontario M2J 1W8

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 23, 2021 Pass View PDF
Nov 06, 2020 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Jun 26, 2017 Pass View PDF
Jul 27, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 14, 2013 Pass View PDF
Jun 25, 2012 Pass with Conditions View PDF