skip to content

Meridia Medical Group

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1881 Yonge Street
Suite 501
Toronto Ontario M4S 3C4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Mar 17, 2020 Pending
Mar 09, 2020 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 10, 2014 Pass View PDF
Apr 23, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 10, 2012 Pass with Conditions View PDF