skip to content

Provis Endoscopy Services - Oakville

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
710 Dorval Drive
Suite 202
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 27, 2020 Pending
Sep 21, 2016 Pass View PDF
Jul 27, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 20, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 04, 2011 Pass View PDF