skip to content

Wilderman Medical Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
8054 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1W3

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Sep 09, 2020 Pass View PDF
Jul 16, 2019 Pass View PDF
Mar 30, 2017 Pass View PDF
Jun 24, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 01, 2012 Pass View PDF