skip to content

Rice Medicine Professional Corporation

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 345
North York Ontario M2J 1V1

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 29, 2018 Pass View PDF
Aug 28, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 14, 2014 Pass View PDF
Apr 05, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 05, 2012 Pass View PDF