skip to content

Richmond Hill Medical and Surgical Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
9080 Yonge Street
Upper level
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Nov 26, 2021 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Aug 19, 2020 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 07, 2020 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 08, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jun 07, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 23, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jun 10, 2013 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF