skip to content

Women's Care Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 501
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Mar 19, 2019 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
May 30, 2018 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 05, 2018 Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate) View PDF
Aug 17, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 18, 2012 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF