Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jan 27, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 19, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 30, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 05, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 17, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 18, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|