skip to content

Inovo Medical

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1328 Labrie Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1B 3M1

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 26, 2019 Pending
Apr 05, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 07, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Feb 08, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Jul 18, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 02, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 20, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 03, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF