skip to content

Silver Medical Group Centre For Pain Care

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
4646 Dufferin Street
Unit 9
Toronto Ontario M3H 5S4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 17, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
May 11, 2018 Pass View PDF
Mar 05, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 17, 2014 Pass View PDF
Apr 22, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 15, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 05, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 21, 2011 Pass View PDF