Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
May 31, 2022
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 04, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 22, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 17, 2021
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 09, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 21, 2020
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 05, 2020
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 17, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 09, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 10, 2014
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 23, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 10, 2012
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|