skip to content

Brampton Cosmetic Surgery Center & Medical Spa

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
111 Queen Street East
Units 2-4
Brampton Ontario L6W 2A9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 08, 2018 Pass View PDF
Apr 25, 2018 Pass View PDF
Dec 19, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 22, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Feb 10, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 09, 2012 Pass View PDF