skip to content

Dynamic Medical Center

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
5734 Yonge Street
Suite 300
Toronto Ontario M2M 4E7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Mar 22, 2021 Pending
Mar 19, 2021 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 24, 2017 Pass View PDF
Apr 06, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 15, 2011 Pass View PDF