skip to content

Promed Endoscopy Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1315 Finch Avenue West
Suite 302
North York Ontario M3J 2G6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Nov 05, 2018 Pass View PDF
Jul 18, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 02, 2016 Pass View PDF
Nov 20, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 07, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
May 07, 2012 Pass View PDF