skip to content

North Scarborough Endoscopy Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 105
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 07, 2017 Pass View PDF
Jun 28, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 23, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 01, 2014 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Jul 22, 2011 Pass View PDF