skip to content

York Endoscopy & Specialist Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Unit 103
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 04, 2022 Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate) View PDF
May 27, 2022 Fail (OHP not allowed to operate) View PDF
Apr 20, 2022 Fail (OHP not allowed to operate) View PDF
Mar 04, 2022 Fail (OHP not allowed to operate) View PDF
May 30, 2019 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 24, 2018 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 15, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Dec 22, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF