skip to content

The Clinic at Beverly Hills

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
33 Beverly Hills Drive
Toronto Ontario M3L 1A2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 02, 2022 Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate) View PDF
Jan 21, 2022 Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate)
Nov 25, 2021 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Aug 24, 2020 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jul 05, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 26, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF