Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Sep 29, 2022
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 02, 2022
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 21, 2022
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate)
|
|
Nov 25, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 24, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 05, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 26, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|