skip to content

Clearview Institute

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
4100 Yonge Street, Suite 110
Toronto Ontario M2P 2B7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 14, 2022 In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
Aug 20, 2019 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
May 25, 2017 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jun 23, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 10, 2011 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF