skip to content

Clarity Eye Institute

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
Unit A7
9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Dec 04, 2017 Pass View PDF
Oct 27, 2017 Pass View PDF
Nov 21, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 03, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 21, 2011 Pass View PDF