skip to content

Ancaster Endoscopy Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1144 Wilson Street West
Suite 205
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 06, 2021 Pending
Jan 22, 2021 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 22, 2019 Pass View PDF
Feb 08, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 28, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jan 28, 2013 Pass View PDF