Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jan 08, 2021
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Aug 24, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 25, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 22, 2016
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 13, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|