skip to content

Capilia by Regency Medical Hair Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
595 Montreal Road
Suite 303
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4L2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 28, 2018 Withdrawal
Feb 10, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 10, 2014 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2013 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Sep 05, 2012 Pass View PDF