skip to content

Family Practice and Chronic Pain Management

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
688 Coxwell Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4C 3B7

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Mar 28, 2022 In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
Jun 19, 2019 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jun 05, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Sep 27, 2018 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Sep 14, 2018 Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 03, 2017 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 19, 2012 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF