skip to content

Canadian Place Endoscopy

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
1065 Canadian Place
Unit 122-123
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0C2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 10, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 24, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
May 25, 2017 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 17, 2014 Pass View PDF
Jan 31, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 09, 2012 Pass View PDF