skip to content

Ottawa Endoscopy and Day Surgery Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
267 O'Connor Street
Suite 207
Ottawa Ontario K2P 1V3

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jan 18, 2017 Pass View PDF
Nov 17, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 01, 2016 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Oct 20, 2016 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Apr 30, 2012 Pass View PDF