skip to content

Prince Arthur Surgical Center Inc.

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
64 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1B4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 24, 2017 Withdrawal
Oct 05, 2015 Pass View PDF
Dec 12, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 14, 2014 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 05, 2013 Pass View PDF
Nov 04, 2011 Pass View PDF