Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jan 19, 2021
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Jul 16, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 25, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 27, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 06, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 19, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 06, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|