Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Nov 30, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 09, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 27, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 06, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 05, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 15, 2014
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|