Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Dec 13, 2021
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Dec 08, 2020
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 20, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 03, 2014
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jul 04, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|