skip to content

Oak Ridges Aesthetic Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 401
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 25, 2021 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 19, 2018 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 07, 2018 Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 07, 2016 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 12, 2013 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jan 25, 2012 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF