Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Sep 07, 2022
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 25, 2021
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 19, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 07, 2018
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 07, 2016
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 12, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jan 25, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|