Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Jan 08, 2021
|
Withdrawn (OHP not allowed to Operate)
|
|
Sep 17, 2020
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 25, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 23, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Mar 01, 2017
|
Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 20, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|