skip to content

Tri City Colonoscopy Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Unit 200
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 14, 2022 In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
Jun 26, 2018 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 04, 2018 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 24, 2017 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 19, 2015 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Aug 31, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Apr 27, 2012 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF