Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Nov 01, 2022
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 26, 2018
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 04, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 24, 2017
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 19, 2015
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Aug 31, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Apr 27, 2012
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|