skip to content

Precision Sport & Spine

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
2334 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville Ontario L6L 1H5

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jun 12, 2019 Pass View PDF
May 30, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 11, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 03, 2018 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Dec 22, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF