skip to content

Briarwood Cosmetic Surgical Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
408 North Service Road East
Unit 1
Oakville Ontario L6H 5R2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
May 20, 2022 Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate) View PDF
Nov 17, 2020 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jun 24, 2014 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Sep 10, 2013 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 22, 2012 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF