Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Feb 02, 2024
|
In Progress (OHP allowed to operate)
|
|
Sep 20, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Feb 14, 2023
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 17, 2020
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 24, 2014
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Sep 10, 2013
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Nov 22, 2012
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|