skip to content

Elements Surgery Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
195 Avenue Road
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J3

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 08, 2019 Pass View PDF
Jul 30, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jul 04, 2017 Pass View PDF
Mar 21, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 02, 2012 Pass View PDF