skip to content

Interventional Pain Management Solutions

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
6 Maginn Mews
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M3C 0G9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Dec 09, 2019 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Aug 02, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jun 07, 2017 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 10, 2016 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 13, 2012 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF