skip to content

The Hair Loss Recovery Program Inc.

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
39 Pleasant Boulevard Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M4T 1K2

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Jul 06, 2017 Withdrawal
Jun 22, 2017 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Jan 25, 2016 Pass View PDF
Mar 05, 2015 Pass View PDF
May 07, 2012 Pass View PDF