skip to content

Intestinal Health Institute

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
8312 McCowan Road
Suite 205
Markham Ontario L3P 8E1

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Oct 18, 2021 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Oct 26, 2017 Pass View PDF
Nov 30, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Aug 23, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Apr 30, 2012 Pass View PDF