skip to content

Provis Endoscopy Services - Mississauga

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
3095 Glen Erin Drive
Suite 7-10
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1J3

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 17, 2019 Pending
Oct 03, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
May 16, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Apr 26, 2018 Fail - OHP procedures not permitted View PDF
Jul 20, 2016 Pass View PDF
Jun 02, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 04, 2016 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 04, 2011 Pass View PDF