skip to content

Interventional Pain Management Solutions

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
6 Maginn Mews
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M3C 0G9

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Aug 06, 2019 Pending
Aug 02, 2019 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Jun 07, 2017 Pass View PDF
Feb 10, 2016 Pass View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Nov 13, 2012 Pass View PDF