Date | Outcome/Status | Details |
Sep 20, 2023
|
Pass (OHP allowed to operate)
|
View PDF
|
Jun 12, 2019
|
Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
May 30, 2019
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 11, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Oct 03, 2018
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|
Dec 22, 2015
|
Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate)
|
View PDF
|