skip to content

Windsor Essex County Comprehensive Pain Clinic

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an Out-of-Hospital Premises (OHP) relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP.

Summary

Current Business Address:
486 Advance Blvd
Unit 140
Tecumseh ON N8N 0B8

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Feb 02, 2022 Pass with Conditions (OHP allowed to operate) View PDF
Jun 28, 2021 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 01, 2021 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Nov 19, 2020 Fail (OHP Not allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 06, 2020 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jun 14, 2019 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Oct 03, 2018 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Feb 10, 2016 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Dec 02, 2015 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Jun 10, 2013 Pass (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Mar 21, 2013 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF
Sep 07, 2012 Pass with Conditions (OHP Allowed to Operate) View PDF